THE MANNA HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 286358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £121.43k £120.31k £148.09k £126.17k £188.52k
Total expenditure £147.16k £136.80k £277.27k £154.59k £155.59k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £0 £34.92k £26.25k £54.44k
Income from government grants £12.50k £24.29k N/A N/A N/A