1ST EALING NORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 286390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time Download