1ST EALING NORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 286390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.68k £34.83k £36.58k £35.96k £26.81k
Total expenditure £27.43k £25.27k £24.36k £30.40k £21.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A