THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S BROUGHTON WITH ST JAMES BOSSINGTON

Charity number: 286718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Philip William Bowden Trustee 16 October 2019
THOMAS DOWSE'S CHARITY Received: On time
BROUGHTON UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
Mark Charles William Bateman Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Brian Peter Matthews Chair 26 September 2018 None on record
Jane Elizabeth Eaton Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
MICHAEL ROBERT MOORE Trustee 22 March 2017
TEST VALLEY ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
Jeremy Booker Trustee 27 September 2014
WINCHESTER SCIENCE CENTRE Received: On time
Rodney Gordon Franks Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Christopher Lloyd Churchw'n Trustee 27 September 2014 None on record