FAITH CHAPEL PENTECOSTAL ASSEMBLIES OF THE WORLD (APOSTALIC UK)

Charity number: 286735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 April 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2018 26 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download