FAITH CHAPEL PENTECOSTAL ASSEMBLIES OF THE WORLD (APOSTALIC UK)

Charity number: 286735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £116.17k £116.88k £147.53k £932 £1.91k
Total expenditure £74.43k £80.91k £78.10k £228.95k £500
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A