Accounts and annual returns THE OLDCASTLE CHARITY

Charity number: 286839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required