Financial history THE OLDCASTLE CHARITY

Charity number: 286839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £10.61k £9.28k £11.46k £11.61k £11.50k
Total expenditure £7.44k £9.46k £5.73k £7.80k £9.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A