VALLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286963
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.74k £25.29k £33.14k £24.68k £31.88k
Total expenditure £20.16k £28.63k £12.76k £8.03k £60.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A