VALLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286963
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required