Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, CAPEL ST MARY

Charity number: 286971
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required