Accounts and annual returns PENWITH AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 287216
Charity reporting is overdue by 1542 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1176 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1176 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1542 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1542 days