Financial history PENWITH AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 287216
Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £809 £72 £547 £1.04k £666
Total expenditure £0 £1.06k £412 £425 £853
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A