Financial history THE RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 287301
Charity reporting is overdue by 246 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.76k £12.13k £13.24k £12.71k £29.11k
Total expenditure £14.32k £13.02k £14.35k £11.74k £12.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.71k