Financial history BRIGHTON AND HOVE SOCIAL WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 287516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £202.22k £219.11k £183.35k £197.45k £276.54k
Total expenditure £213.39k £194.32k £195.22k £213.51k £219.91k
Income from government contracts £47.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £90.00k £141.14k £133.38k £133.70k £185.46k