ST FRANCIS' COLLEGE TRUST

Charity number: 287694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.76m £6.07m £6.45m £6.48m £6.10m
Total expenditure £6.35m £6.29m £6.14m £6.17m £6.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £151.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.41k £8.06k £1.29k £6.55k £2.20k
Income - Other trading activities £96.33k £89.64k £139.32k £135.13k £39.60k
Income - Charitable activities £5.65m £5.97m £6.31m £6.34m £5.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.23k £158 £0 £0 £20.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £151.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.35m £6.29m £6.14m £6.17m £6.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £7.43k £25.83k £53.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.67k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0