ADDINGTON ST MARY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 287701
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £8.90k £20.66k £11.65k £1.89k £901
Total expenditure £12.60k £10.40k £130.05k £1.19k £10.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A