HIGHGATE PRIMARY AND BLANCHE NEVILE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288558
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Annual return 14 August 2019 17 June 2021 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2019 17 June 2021 368 days late Download
Annual return 14 August 2018 28 February 2020 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2018 28 February 2020 259 days late Download
Annual return 14 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 14 August 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2016 21 January 2017 On time Download