HIGHGATE PRIMARY AND BLANCHE NEVILE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288558
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/08/2015 14/08/2016 14/08/2017 14/08/2018 14/08/2019
Total gross income £35.25k £25.90k £34.62k £58.86k £44.26k
Total expenditure £18.94k £62.72k £32.70k £27.00k £50.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £206