TILES AND ARCHITECTURAL CERAMICS SOCIETY

Charity number: 289090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.95k £12.18k £12.67k £14.13k £22.82k
Total expenditure £9.92k £9.57k £12.73k £14.43k £14.53k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £1.00k N/A N/A