BRITISH PREGNANCY ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity number: 289145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.08m £29.38m £31.25m £34.38m £39.24m
Total expenditure £29.44m £29.29m £30.98m £34.22m £39.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £33.71m £38.27m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £250.00k N/A £923.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.00k £19.00k £27.00k £666.00k £42.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £29.07m £29.36m £31.22m £33.71m £39.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £1.00k £2.00k £6.00k £3.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.44m £29.29m £30.97m £34.22m £39.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £87.00k £87.00k £86.00k £74.00k £64.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £3.00k £0 £0