BRITISH PREGNANCY ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity number: 289145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR CATHY WARWICK Chair None on record
Dr Anna Glasier Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Dr David Munroe DICKSON Trustee 25 January 2013
FRIENDS OF VICTORIA HOSPITAL WIMBORNE Received: On time
Professor Calliope Christina Samoulla Farsides Trustee 25 November 2016 None on record
Amanda Callaghan Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record
John Collier Trustee 24 January 2014 None on record
Sanjay Shah Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record
Anne Shevas Trustee 28 November 2014
HOME-START UK Received: On time
Lucy Moore Trustee 18 March 2017 None on record
Dr Clare Gerada Trustee 28 November 2014
DOCTORS IN DISTRESS Received: On time