CREEKSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 289744
Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jo Jones Trustee 14 November 2017 None on record
Cheryl Howell Trustee 14 November 2016 None on record
Margaret Harris Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
ANN PARKER Chair 14 November 2017 None on record
Claire Lamplough Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Ann Pearson Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Cheryl Downie Trustee 14 November 2017 None on record
Carole Barfoot Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Pauline Kirby Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Barbara Edwards Trustee 12 November 2015 None on record
Susan Moore Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
Susan Phillips Trustee 14 November 2016 None on record