Accounts and annual returns THE WALDORF SCHOOL OF SOUTH-WEST LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 289801
Charity reporting is overdue by 358 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window