Financial history THE WALDORF SCHOOL OF SOUTH-WEST LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 289801
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £592.37k £671.91k £665.84k £477.66k £468.18k
Total expenditure £580.11k £704.08k £590.08k £438.97k £413.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £58.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.23k £1.95k £153.91k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £66.01k £63.66k £25.63k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £507.11k £606.26k £486.27k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £22 £45 £31 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £539.70k £665.65k £585.67k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.41k £38.44k £4.40k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.00k £13.25k £7.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A