Financial history DARTFORD PRIMARY ACADEMY FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £6.77k £4.81k £2.83k £2.72k £5.79k
Total expenditure £5.97k £4.04k £4.14k £2.81k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A