WEST LEA SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 289890
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £21.91k £7.56k £4.14k £4.24k £2.26k
Total expenditure £15.84k £11.40k £3.96k £2.65k £1.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A