NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND BUCKINGHAMSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.51k £222 £5.67k £1.30k £1.61k
Total expenditure £1.42k £932 £2.51k £2.47k £754
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A