ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF EAST SUSSEX YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 290042
Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 January 2020 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 October 2018 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required