ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF EAST SUSSEX YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 290042
Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £2.62k £2.76k £1.39k £9.35k £482
Total expenditure £784 £4.32k £84 £201 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A