Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS EVANGELICAL MISSION (PERU)

Charity number: 290252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 January 2019 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download Open in new window