Financial history ST ANDREWS EVANGELICAL MISSION (PERU)

Charity number: 290252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £113.66k £129.22k £110.34k £127.52k £118.25k
Total expenditure £101.43k £121.47k £101.67k £106.41k £106.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A