BECK ROW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 August 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 March 2019 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required