Accounts and annual returns IES LONDON THE LONDON CENTRE OF THE INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS (ILLINOIS) LIMITED

Charity number: 290456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window