Financial history MRS L D ROPE'S THIRD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 290533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £1.58m £1.58m £1.55m £2.11m £1.46m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.97m £1.63m £1.66m £1.70m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £49.20k £49.47k £5.32k £375.01k £0
Income - Charitable activities £50.48k £44.97k £29.32k £13.74k £6.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.48m £1.48m £1.51m £1.72m £1.32m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £128.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.67m £1.45m £1.48m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £171.85k £182.39k £180.11k £180.50k £197.67k
Expenditure - Governance £67.42k £221.33k £224.73k £235.48k £271.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £646.85k £796.47k £462.83k £457.90k £606.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £171.85k £182.39k £180.11k £180.50k £197.67k
Expenditure - Other £35.42k £117.48k £0 £0 £0