ST EDMUND'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.66k £8.19k £13.29k £10.54k £6.43k
Total expenditure £13.87k £9.74k £4.58k £13.60k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A