THE ALICE TRUST

Charity number: 290859
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2954 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2954 days
Annual return 28 February 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3319 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3319 days
Annual return 28 February 2011 25 November 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 25 November 2011 On time
Annual return 28 February 2010 04 January 2011 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 04 January 2011 7 days late
Annual return 28 February 2009 22 December 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 22 December 2009 On time