THE ALICE TRUST

Charity number: 290859
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2007 29/02/2008 28/02/2009 28/02/2010 28/02/2011
Total gross income £1.96m £13.02m £7.88m £40.39m £13.96m
Total expenditure £2.22m £9.03m £7.12m £9.52m £10.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.77m £6.10m £1.51m £33.73m £5.16m
Income - Other trading activities £5.26m £6.59m £6.09m £6.40m £8.48m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £191.69k £324.85k £281.39k £258.16k £316.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.20m £2.93m £1.21m £3.50m £2.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.63k £12.62k £13.34k £10.50k £30.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.00m £2.72m £985.00k £3.18m £2.25m
Expenditure - Investment management £7.57k £11.47k £17.81k £3.97k £4.56k
Expenditure - Other £0 £6.07m £5.89m £0 £7.84m