CALCUTTA RESCUE FUND

Charity number: 290917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £200.10k £134.45k £189.78k £240.60k £626.12k
Total expenditure £109.36k £135.25k £220.42k £227.78k £599.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £625.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £193
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £38
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £598.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.08k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £180
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0