Trustees 3RD SANDHURST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 290940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Erica Clare Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Paula Ronan Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
JONATHAN CLAYTON Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record
Christopher Jackson Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Kevin Salzedo Trustee 16 June 2014
None on record
Mark Bird Trustee 16 June 2014
None on record
PHILLIP PORTER Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record
GRAHAM DAVIES Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record
BRENDA DAVIES Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record