Financial history THE REDCOATS SOCIETY, THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE RIFLES (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) MUSEUM

Charity number: 291191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.51k £2.36k £1.98k £3.48k £1.86k
Total expenditure £1.72k £1.82k £902 £4.70k £4.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A