Financial history ST NICOLAS AND ST MARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.17k £14.13k £13.79k £20.37k £8.15k
Total expenditure £4.62k £20.35k £8.79k £11.75k £891
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A