Financial history NORFOLK AND NORWICH NATURALISTS' SOCIETY

Charity number: 291604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.28k £15.52k £78.92k £38.79k £34.94k
Total expenditure £16.61k £15.62k £18.85k £26.04k £29.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £0 N/A N/A N/A