CONSONANT LTD

Charity number: 291789
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £718.58k £501.99k £1.56m £1.26m £1.18m
Total expenditure £767.57k £755.52k £1.39m £1.62m £1.62m
Income from government contracts £213.83k £350.34k £0 N/A £278.48k
Income from government grants £156.56k £151.65k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £994 £41.55k £701.12k £489.53k £427.30k
Income - Other trading activities £2.96k £26.92k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £711.52k £433.34k £392.11k £678.47k £678.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £70 £187 £24.70k £35.65k £26.66k
Income - Other £3.04k £0 £440.22k £56.05k £48.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £54.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £761.15k £683.16k £1.32m £1.48m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £13.20k £67.37k £143.33k £118.87k
Expenditure - Governance £3.65k £5.50k £7.76k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.78k £59.16k £0 £0 £0