Financial history THE STUART ROSSITER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 292076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.52k £27.30k £44.02k £27.07k £23.64k
Total expenditure £21.36k £18.02k £28.48k £6.67k £8.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A