Financial history Friends of Robert Barclay academy

Charity number: 292090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £6.76k £14.04k £6.99k £10.49k £1.22k
Total expenditure £4.44k £12.54k £4.71k £7.40k £245
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A