Accounts and annual returns THE OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE ROWING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 292325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window