ASHLEY GREEN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 292478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.07k £41.97k £45.99k £39.63k £44.07k
Total expenditure £32.66k £39.59k £43.20k £69.43k £37.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A