ASHLEY GREEN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 292478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Broschomb Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
JACQUI ROSE Trustee None on record
Robert Warren Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Mark Broschomb Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Jan Barbour Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
Rob Youngs Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Sophia Munroe Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
JOHN MAYNE Trustee 17 August 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM Received: On time
Helen Woodley Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
Shelagh Watts Trustee 14 June 2016 None on record
DAVID HARMER Trustee None on record
Lesley Popescu Trustee 07 September 2011 None on record
ROGER WATTS Trustee None on record
MARY AXON Trustee None on record
Rob Barnes Trustee 12 June 2018 None on record
Geoff Cullingham Trustee 12 June 2018 None on record