NARBOROUGH AND NARFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 292588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £24.42k £23.27k £23.80k £33.31k £29.64k
Total expenditure £23.71k £23.38k £23.45k £30.95k £25.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.30k N/A